CA SB169 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 212.5, 221.6, 221.8, 230, 231.5, 260, and 66262.5 of, and to add Sections 212.7 and 66281.8 to, the Education Code, relating to education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education: sex equity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB169 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 169 Jackson Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 61 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB169 Jackson et al (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2017-10-15 Vetoed by the Governor.
2017-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 2924.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 3260.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-09-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-06-28AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-06-19AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 1305.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1178.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 851.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 782.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-03-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-02SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code212.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code212.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code212.81New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code221.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code221.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code230Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code231.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code231.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code260Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66262.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66281.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback