CA SB166 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 13559) to Chapter 7 of Division 7 of the Water Code, relating to water quality.
Title
Process water treatment systems: breweries.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB166 Wiener et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB166 Wiener et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | June 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1001.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 968.) (May 6). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 549.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 13559 | New Code | See Bill Text |