CA SB166 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65863 of the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential density and affordability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB166 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 166 Skinner Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB166 Skinner (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-22SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2959.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 3418.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-08-31AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-31AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 2826.)
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 1384.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 884.) (April 26).
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-03-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 327.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-03SenateSet for hearing March 7.
2017-03-02SenateRe-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
2017-03-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-02SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-03-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-02SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-01-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code4055Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code65863Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback