CA SB165 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 279, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 19829.9849, 19829.9850, 19829.9851, and 22944.6 of the Government Code, relating to state employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employment: State Bargaining Units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - SB 165 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB165 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB165 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 279, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2021-09-09SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-07AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2021-09-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-25Assembly(Corrected May 14).
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-02-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 290.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-02-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-16SenateOrdered to second reading.
2021-02-16SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-01-11SenateRead first time.
2021-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2021-01-08SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback