CA SB165 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14146 and 14146.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical interpretation services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB165 Atkins et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 165 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Bonta (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB165 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-11SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-03AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1091.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-22SenateApril 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 490.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-01-29SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14146Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14146.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback