CA SB165 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-23 - August 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-23 - August 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 54238.10 of the Government Code, relating to highways.
Title
Highways: surplus nonresidential property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB165 Portantino (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB165 Portantino (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 643.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 362.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19613.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54238.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |