CA SB162 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 351, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25150.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Treated wood waste.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB162 Galgiani Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Assembly - SB 162 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB162 Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 351, Statutes of 2015.
2015-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2015-09-02SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2422.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-09-01SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2015-09-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2719.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2015-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2015-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1197.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-05-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1148.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2015-05-18SenateMay 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2015-05-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 29).
2015-04-24SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2015-04-16SenateApril 15 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 3. Page 649.) Reconsideration granted.
2015-03-18SenateSet for hearing April 15.
2015-03-17SenateMarch 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-03-03SenateSet for hearing March 18.
2015-02-19SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2015-02-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
2015-02-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25150.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_162&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20150203_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20150505_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20150622_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20150903_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20150928_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20150415_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20150429_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20150528_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20150601_0633PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20150518_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20150630_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20150827_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20150901_1028AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20150902_0431PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback