CA SB162 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11019.8 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development: federally recognized Indian tribes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB162 Anderson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-21 Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-05-21 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2012-04-30 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2011-07-06 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-06-09 Referred to Com. on G.O.
2011-06-01 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2011-05-31 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1190.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2011-05-24 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-23 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1085.) (May 23).
2011-05-16 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-05-13 Set for hearing May 23.
2011-05-12 Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-05-06 Set for hearing May 16.
2011-05-02 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-04-25 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 2.
2011-04-14 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 12).
2011-03-30 Set for hearing April 12.
2011-03-29 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2011-02-10 Referred to Com. on G.O.
2011-02-03 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
2011-02-02 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19817Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19933New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code19934New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code11019.8Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_162&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20110202_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20110329_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20110425_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20110516_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20120430_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20120521_amended_asm_v94.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20110412_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20110523_000004_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20110531_0508PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback