CA SB161 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 560, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 560, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 49414.7 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Schools: emergency medical assistance: administration of
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB161 Huff Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Assembly - SB 161 Huff Senate Third Reading By CEDILLO (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB161 Huff (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Assembly - SB 161 Huff Senate Third Reading By CEDILLO (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB161 Huff (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 560, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2011-09-01 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2235.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-30 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 21. Page 2696.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-13 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and ED. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1277.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1113.) (May 26). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-25 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-03 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-26 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-25 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 580.) (April 6). | |
2011-03-23 | Set for hearing April 6. | |
2011-03-16 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 360.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-03-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-08 | Set for hearing March 16. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. | |
2011-02-03 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49414.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |