CA SB16 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member McCarty.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member McCarty.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 706.053 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to wage garnishment.
Title
Wage garnishment restrictions: exempt earnings: student loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Assembly - SB 16 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By MCCARTY (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB16 Wieckowski (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB16 Wieckowski (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member McCarty. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 24. Page 2408.) |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 13). |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 703.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 538.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 706.053 | New Code | See Bill Text |