CA SB16 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 14526.7, 14526.8, and 16321 to the Government Code, to amend Sections 7360, 10752, and 60050 of, and to add Sections 7361.2, 7653.2, 60050.2, and 60201.4 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to add Section 2103.1 to, and to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 2030) to Division 3 of, the Streets and Highways Code, and to add Sections 9250.3, 9250.6, and 9400.5 to the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Transportation funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Beall. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1145.) (May 28). |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | May 26 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 919.) (May 6). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 824.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14526.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14526.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 16321 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 10752 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 60050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 60050.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 60201.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7361.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7653.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2103.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 9250.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 9250.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 9400.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |