CA SB16 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12206, 17058, 19611, and 23610.5 of, and to add Sections 17058.6 and 23610.6 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Low-income housing tax credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-12-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-02-11 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-02-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 136.) | |
2009-01-29 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Set for hearing February 4. | |
2009-01-08 | To Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2008-12-02 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |