CA SB158 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 34100 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to the community redevelopment commission.
Title
Community redevelopment commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-03 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 34100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_158&sess=1112&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_158_bill_20110202_introduced.html |