CA SB1520 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 766, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 766, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11346.2 and 11346.3 of the Government Code, relating to state government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State government: administrative efficiency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1520 Calderon Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1520 Calderon Third Reading Urgency By DICKINSON (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1520 Calderon Third Reading Urgency By DICKINSON Amend By DICKINSON Set #1 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1520 Calderon Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1520 Calderon Third Reading Urgency By DICKINSON (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1520 Calderon Third Reading Urgency By DICKINSON Amend By DICKINSON Set #1 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1520 Calderon Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 766, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2012-08-31 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5075.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-28 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-27 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6352.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6171.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-15 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-06-11 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-06-11 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3810.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3598.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-24 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-22 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3515.) (May 14). | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24 in APPR. pending receipt. | |
2012-05-01 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 3264.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2012-04-10 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11346.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11346.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65923.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65958 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |