CA SB152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 728, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Chapter 3.76 (commencing with Section 7292.8) of Part 1.7 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transactions and use taxes: County of Sonoma.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 152 McGuire Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB152 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - SB 152 Hernandez Senate Third Reading Amend By WOOD Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SB 152 Hernandez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB152 Hernandez et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 728, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 6169.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 6199.)
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6112.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-08-31SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 28).
2018-08-27AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-08-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 6548.)
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2018-08-23AssemblyAssembly Rule 78 suspended.
2017-07-17AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2017-07-17AssemblyAction rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
2017-07-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2017-07-13SenateOrdered to the Assembly.
2017-07-06SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-07-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2473.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2017-06-27AssemblyJune 27 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 904.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-31SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback