CA SB151 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12099.1, 12099.2, 12099.3, 12099.4, 10299.5, 12099.6, 12099.7, 12100.61, 12100.62, 12100.63, 12100.65, 12100.67, 12100.83, and 13995.44 of, and to add and repeal Article 4.4 (commencing with Section 12096.6) and Article 9 (commencing with section 12100.90) of Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2, and Sections 12100.83.5 and 12100.83.6 of, and to repeal Section 12099 of, the Government Code, and to amend Section 18410.2 of, and to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 19292) to Chapter 5 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 to, and to add and repeal Section 17158.1 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to economic development, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Economic development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Assembly - SB 151 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB151 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB151 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB151 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB151 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1767.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2193.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 2188.) |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 285.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 10299.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12096.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12099.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12099.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12099.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12099.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12099.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12099.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12100.61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12100.62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12100.63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12100.65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12100.67 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12100.83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13995.44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17158.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18410.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19292 | New Code | See Bill Text |