CA SB151 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11320, 13300, and 13303 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 151 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB151 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB151 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2529.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2967.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 742.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 367.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 11320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |