CA SB151 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 16180, 16182, 16183, 16184, 16186.5, 16200, 16202, and 27282 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 2505, 2514, 2515, 2781, 20503, 20505, 20583, 20585, 20586, 20621, 20627, 20630, 20640.3, 20641, 20645.5, and 20645.6 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax postponement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2017-05-25SenateMay 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-03SenateApril 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 444.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code16180Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16182Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16183Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16184Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16186.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16200Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16202Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code27282Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20503Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20505Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20583Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20585Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20586Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20621Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20627Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20630Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20640.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20641Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20645.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code20645.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code2505Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code2514Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code2515Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code2781Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback