CA SB151 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Part 4.7 (commencing with Section 14700) of the Penal Code, relating to reentry.
Title
Reentry courts: pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-04-24 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2009-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 587.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-17 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2009-02-23 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-02-13 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |
2009-02-12 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |