CA SB1504 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 903, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 19218 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 6276.14, 6276.34, 19993, 19993.05, 19995.4, 19999.5, 20677.5, 20677.6, 20677.7, 20677.71, 20677.8, 20677.9, 20677.91, 20677.95, 20681, and 22877 of the Government Code, to amend Section 12693.63 of the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 201 and 202 of the Labor Code, to amend Section 13600 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 14021.31 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to state employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employment: retirement savings plans, employment conditions, and training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1504 P.E. & R. (Pan) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1504 P.E. & R. Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1504 P.E. & R (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 903, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6113.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-30SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6070.)
2018-08-29SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5927.) Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2018-08-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6710.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-16AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom consent calendar.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5015.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4790.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-03-21SenateReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2018-03-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 14.
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code19218Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19993Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19993.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19995.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19999.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20677.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20677.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20677.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20677.71Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20677.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20677.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20677.91Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20677.95Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20681Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22877Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6276.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6276.34Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code12693.63Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code201Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code202Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13600Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14021.31Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback