CA SB1502 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2782.6 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 42301.6 of, and to add Section 40006 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 7856 of the Labor Code, relating to nonvehicular air pollution.
Title
Nonvehicular air pollution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - SB 1502 E.Q. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1502 E.Q. (Wieckowski) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1502 E.Q. (Wieckowski) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5822.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4721.) (April 18). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 8. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2782.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 40006 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 40440.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 40440.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42301.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 7856 | Amended Code | Citation Text |