CA SB1502 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2782.6 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 42301.6 of, and to add Section 40006 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 7856 of the Labor Code, relating to nonvehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonvehicular air pollution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Assembly - SB 1502 E.Q. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1502 E.Q. (Wieckowski) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-06-18SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-06-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5822.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11).
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-23SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4721.) (April 18).
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-03-21SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2018-03-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 8.
2018-03-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback