CA SB1501 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 875, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 875, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51051, 51053, 51054, 51055, 51059, 51084, and 51087 of, and to repeal Section 51052 of, the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Open-space easements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1501 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1501 Kehoe (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1501 Kehoe (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 875, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-08-22 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6118.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 3637.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-04-19 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3206.) (April 18). | |
2012-04-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-03-30 | Set for hearing April 18. | |
2012-03-29 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-03-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2253 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51052 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51053 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51054 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51059 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51084 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51087 | Amended Code | Citation Text |