CA SB150 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 525, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 69519 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student financial aid: Chafee grant awards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB150 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 150 Beall Senate Third Reading By Maienschein (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB150 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 525, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-04 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2784.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-10SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3178.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-05AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-06-26AssemblyJune 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11).
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1271.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1090.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-29SenateApril 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-20SenateMarch 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-02-26SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-01-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code69519Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback