CA SB150 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 646, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65080 of the Government Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional transportation plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB150 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 150 Allen Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB150 Allen (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 646, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-15SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2690.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-08SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 3041.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (September 1).
2017-09-01AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1264.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1178.) (May 25).
2017-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-11SenateMay 15 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4. Page 857.) (April 25).
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-06SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 622.) (April 5).
2017-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-03-16SenateRe-referred to Coms. on EQ. and T. & H.
2017-03-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65080Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code11222Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback