CA SB1497 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 4.8 (commencing with Section 71370) to Division 34 of the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Polluters Pay Climate Cost Recovery Act of 2024.
Sponsors
Sen. Caroline Menjivar [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71370 | New Code | See Bill Text |