CA SB1491 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to validate the organization, boundaries, acts, proceedings, and bonds of public bodies, and to provide limitations of time in which actions may be commenced, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Validations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Assembly - SB 1491 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1491 GOV. & F. (Caballero) Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1491 GOV. & F. (Caballero) Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5402.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3208.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3149.) (March 17). |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |