CA SB149 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4105 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mail ballot elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code4105Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback