CA SB149 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 6880) to Part 1 of Division 6 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Presidential primary elections: ballot access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB149 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 149 McGuire Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - (Y: 10 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 149 McGuire Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO Amend By HARPER Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB149 McGuire et al (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 149 McGuire Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - (Y: 10 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 149 McGuire Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO Amend By HARPER Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB149 McGuire et al (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2017-10-15 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-15 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2993.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 3401.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Amendments by Assembly Member Harper tabled on motion by Assembly Member Calderon. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3002.) |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 23). |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 1349.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Motion by Senator Monning to lay on table amendments by Senator Anderson adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1348.) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Motion by Senator Monning to lay on table amendments by Senator Anderson adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 1348.) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1178.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 743.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 539.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and E. & C.A. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 6880 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 6901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8304 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |