CA SB149 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 307, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 18506 and 18870.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to mobilehome and special occupancy parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobilehome and special occupancy parks: permit invoice:

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB149 Correa Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 149 Correa Senate Third Reading By TORRES (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB149 Correa (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 307, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-13 Approved by the Governor.
2012-08-31 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7:30 p.m.
2012-08-27 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 4847.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2012-08-24 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2012-08-23 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 6200.) Ordered to the Senate.
2012-08-13 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-09 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
2012-06-28 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-05-25 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2012-04-12 Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2012-01-19 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2012-01-19 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2679.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2012-01-17 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-01-13 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2012-01-11 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2640.) (January 10). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-01-05 Set for hearing January 10.
2012-01-04 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2011-02-10 Referred to Com. on RLS.
2011-02-02 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
2011-02-01 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code798Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code18506Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code18870.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_149&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_bill_20110201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_bill_20120104_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_bill_20120111_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_bill_20120525_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_bill_20120830_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_bill_20120913_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_vote_20120110_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_vote_20120119_0921AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_vote_20120627_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_vote_20120808_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_vote_20120823_0136PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_vote_20120827_0102PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback