CA SB1485 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - May 16 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 5074.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - May 16 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 5074.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17052.7 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income tax: credits: charitable contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - [05-16-2018] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | May 16 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 5074.) Reconsideration granted. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | May 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |