CA SB1481 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 874, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 874, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1206.5, 1211, 1265, and 4052.4 of, and to add Section 1206.6 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to clinical laboratories.
Title
Clinical laboratories: community pharmacies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1481 Negrete McLeod Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1481 Negrete McLeod Senate Third Reading By HAYASHI (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1481 Negrete McLeod (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1481 Negrete McLeod Senate Third Reading By HAYASHI (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1481 Negrete McLeod (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 874, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2012-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5008.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-28 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6464.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6215.) Ordered to the Senate. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 3). | |
2012-06-26 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-06-13 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-06-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). | |
2012-06-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-05-10 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and HEALTH. | |
2012-05-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3398.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-04-30 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3087.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-27 | Set for hearing April 9. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1206.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1206.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1265 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4052.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |