CA SB148 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 15630 to the Government Code, and to amend Sections 6479.3 and 34015 of, to add Sections 7204.5 and 7270.10 to, to add Part 13.5 (commencing with Section 31001) to Division 2 of, and to repeal the heading of Part 13.5 (commencing with Section 31020) of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to cannabis, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
State Board of Equalization: counties: cannabis-related business: cash payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 537.) (March 29). |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15630 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 31001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 31020 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 34015 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6479.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7204.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7270.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |