CA SB1471 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 52735) to Chapter 11 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: quiet reflection.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Sen. Dave Cortese [D] |
Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1471 Stern et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1471 Stern et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4014.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3752.) (April 24). |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 52735 | New Code | See Bill Text |