CA SB147 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 767, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 767, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 798.34 and 799.9 of the Civil Code, relating to mobilehome parks.
Title
Mobilehome parks: residency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB147 Dodd Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 147 Dodd Senate Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB147 Dodd (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 147 Dodd Senate Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB147 Dodd (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 767, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2476.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2840.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 12). |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 6. Page 1143.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Published May 9 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 945.) (May 2). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 798.34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 799.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |