CA SB146 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10159.5, 10159.6, and 10159.7 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to real estate licensees, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Real estate licensees: fictitious business names: team names.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #4 SB146 Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - SB 146 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB146 Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - SB 146 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB146 Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1790.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2178.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | June 16 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 533.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 506.) (April 6). |
2015-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 10159.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 10159.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 10159.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |