CA SB145 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 290 and 290.006 of the Penal Code, relating to sex offenders.
Title
Sex offenders: registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 145 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Kamlager (Y: 41 N: 25 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB145 Wiener Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB145 Wiener (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB145 Wiener Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB145 Wiener (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 10.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 25. Page 5460.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (August 20). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 9). |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 3. Page 1326.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1090.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | April 2 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 290 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290.006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |