CA SB145 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 725, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 38750 of the Vehicle Code, relating to autonomous vehicles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autonomous vehicles: testing on public roads.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB145 Hill et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 145 Hill Third Reading Urgency By BERMAN (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB145 Hill Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 725, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-22SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3009.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-15AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 3493.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-13AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2017-09-13AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3254.)
2017-09-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-09-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 23).
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-03AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C.
2017-05-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-04SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 959.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-01SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 750.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-01-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17.
2017-01-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code38750Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback