CA SB1448 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6007.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6007.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1448&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1448_bill_20140221_introduced.html |