CA SB1441 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - April 24 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 4820.)
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - April 24 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 4820.)
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 597.6 of the Penal Code, relating to animal cruelty.
Title
Animal cruelty: declawing.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | April 24 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 4820.) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 597.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |