CA SB144 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 674, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 674, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12670.14 of the Water Code, relating to water resources.
Title
Water development projects: Sacramento-San Joaquin watersheds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 144 Pan Senate Third Reading By GALLAGHER (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB144 Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB144 Pan (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 674, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2847.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | July 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1196.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1148.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | April 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 405.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 12670.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |