CA SB1438 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 491, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 491, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1797.170, 1797.197, and 11601 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: opioid antagonists.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] |
Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1438 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1438 Pavley Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1438 Pavley (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1438 Pavley Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1438 Pavley (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 491, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4947.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6540.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6340.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3533.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3312.) (April 29). |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3281.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29 in PUB. S. pending receipt. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1714.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.197 | Amended Code | Citation Text |