CA SB1436 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 1797.196 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to automated external defibrillators.
Title
Automated external defibrillators.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] | Sen. Alan Lowenthal [D] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Sen. Curren Price [D] |
Sen. Juan Vargas [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Assembly - SB 1436 Lowenthal Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Special Consent #10 SB1436 Lowenthal (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Special Consent #10 SB1436 Lowenthal (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-06-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-06-25 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-06-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5422.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-20 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |
2012-05-25 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3496.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-09 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-05-08 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-07 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3389.) (May 1). | |
2012-04-24 | Set for hearing May 1. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3143.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-03-27 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1797.196 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |