CA SB1431 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42238.02 of the Education Code, relating to education finance.
Title
Local control funding formula: base grants: adjustment: class size reduction.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent SB1431 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3987.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3796.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3457.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 42238.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |