CA SB1427 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12920, 12921, 12927, 12930, 12931, 12955, 12955.8, 12956.1, and 12956.2 of the Government Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination: veteran or military status.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1427 Hill Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1427 Hill Senate Third Reading By IRWIN (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1427 Hill (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1427 Hill Senate Third Reading By IRWIN (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1427 Hill (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 5548.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 6400.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 5010.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4816.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12927 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12931 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12955 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12955.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12956.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12956.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |