CA SB1416 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1799.111 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 5008 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health services: gravely disabled persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1416 Eggman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1416 Eggman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3975.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3796.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3515.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3462.) (April 20). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1799.111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |