CA SB1414 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 380 of, and to add Section 380.5 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: demand response.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB1414 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1414 Wolk Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1414 Wolk (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1414 Wolk Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1414 Wolk (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4881.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6422.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6231.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5998.) |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was reported from committee on June 25, 2014. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3532.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3296.) (April 29). |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 380.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |