CA SB1413 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6808 of, and to add and repeal Section 6809 of, the Government Code, relating to computation of time.
Title
Year-round standard time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | April 2 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6808 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6809 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |