CA SB1413 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 665, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 19 (commencing with Section 21710) to Part 3 of Division 5 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees’ retirement: pension prefunding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1413 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1413 Nielsen et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1413 Nielsen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 665, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-21 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6151.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4381.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4310.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4789.) (April 23).
2018-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2018-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 23 in P.E. & R. pending receipt.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code21710New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code7522.15Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback