CA SB1412 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 987, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 987, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 432.7 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Applicants for employment: criminal history.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1412 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1412 Bradford Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 45 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1412 Bradford (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1412 Bradford Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 45 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1412 Bradford (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 987, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 6128.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 31. Page 6964.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8). |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4465.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4820.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4626.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and PUB. S. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 432.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |